Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cortez, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with Paul Alessandroni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Alessandroni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOut Of County |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CASE CORRESPONDENCE DOC INFO
Date: June 02, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 02, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CORRESPONDENCE DOC INFO | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 06/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 21000211O | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 06/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: ALESSANDRONI, PAUL | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | JESSICA LUNSFORD CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.