Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nerey Valcarcel, Fredy, represented by Duclos, David, White, Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: January 20, 2021BOOKING DOCUMENT
Date: January 20, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/29/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CHANGE IN PD | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: WHITE, ALEXANDER ASSIGNED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE ARR CONT 3/29 @ 9AM | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND 2021AA010023 POSTED $3,000.00 | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: DUCLOS, DAVID ASSIGNED | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT RELEASE | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.