Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barnett, Jennifer filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hickman, Jamie C, represented by Barnett, Jennifer, Maijala, David, Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: January 20, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: January 20, 2021SURETY BOND PSE15900567 POSTED $3,500.00
Date: January 22, 2021OTHER
Date: February 22, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 05, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: February 11, 2021SURETY BOND PSE15900566 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: January 22, 2021CITATION (TICKET)
Date: January 21, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: January 22, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: January 20, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: January 28, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE ERC 3/22 @ 9:30
Date: February 22, 2021CASE CORRESPONDENCE SCREENING COMPLIANCE FORM
Date: February 22, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 09, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 02, 2021VIOLATION REPORT
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: August 01, 2021VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT RECALLED
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: July 31, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING - SARASOTA CTY
Date: April 13, 2021AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION
Date: July 12, 2021VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT SERVED
Date: July 31, 2021AMENDED VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED
Date: July 12, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 28, 2021VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED
Date: June 11, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING SARASOTA COUNTY
Date: April 30, 2021VIOLATION REPORT
Date: June 11, 2021FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: May 17, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PLEA ENTERED
Date: May 17, 2021ARREST WARRANT REVIEW CHECKLIST
Date: March 29, 2021SENTENCE FORM A/G
Date: May 17, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST
Date: May 17, 2021CASE CORRESPONDENCE - WARRANT WORKSHEET
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION
Date: June 11, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: June 09, 2021JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PLACING DEF ON PROBATION
Date: June 03, 2021BENCH WARRANT SERVED
Date: April 13, 2021BENCH WARRANT ISSUED
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: August 02, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HRG 9/23 @ 9AM
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: August 02, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: July 31, 2021BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: May 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL VOP HEARING SET FOR 09/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HRG 9/23 @ 9AM | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: MAIJALA, DAVID ASSIGNED | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL VOP ADVISEMENT SET FOR 08/16/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 08/01/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE UNSECURED | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEF APP FEE FELONY $50 ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 8/8/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.