Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Concilio, Brian filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Denney, Joseph Wayne, represented by Concilio, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: January 20, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: January 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - CMC 4/28 1:30 | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 4/28 @ 1:30 | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - STANDARD | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND DISCHARGE SLIP | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED SEQ: 1 SAME - (790.23 1C) POSSESS OF WEAPON BY DELINQUENT ACT FELON OTHER ST 2676 | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: SORENSON, CAITLIN E. ASSIGNED | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED SEQ: 4 SAME - (322.34 10B2) DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP FOR SPECIFIED FINANCIAL REAS 7162 | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND PC701454675 (893.13 6A) RELEASED | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DROPPED/ABANDONED (NO FILE) SEQ: 5 SAME - (893.13 6A) CNTL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION DRUGS POSSESS 3695 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.