Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bray, Victoria A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kendzior, Christopher John, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: January 12, 2021CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 6/7 1PM | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCINIDNG ORDER OF NO CONTACT ISSUED 12/21/2020 | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO RECIND NO CONTACT ORDER | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/12/2021 AT 1:00 PM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.