Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bray, Victoria A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Little, Richard Brian, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: December 17, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 29, 2020SURETY BOND AS3K451330 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: December 28, 2020ORDER GRANTING SUPERVISED RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE
Date: December 29, 2020BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: December 28, 2020SURETY BOND AS3K451331 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: December 28, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE -ARR CONT'D 1/20/21
Date: January 06, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 28, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: December 17, 2020NO INFORMATION
Date: January 13, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 07, 2021ROR WORKSHEET
Date: December 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: December 17, 2020RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: December 17, 2020ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: December 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: BRAY, VICTORIA A ASSIGNED | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DROPPED/ABANDONED (NO FILE) SEQ: 3 SAME - (856.011) DISORDERLY INTOXICATION 3245 | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE -ARR CONT'D 1/20/21 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUPERVISED RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AS3K451330 POSTED $1,000.00 | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT RELEASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.