Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Barnett, Jennifer filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Sorenson, Caitlin E., against Datta, Christopher Aaron, represented by Barnett, Jennifer, Ruhl, Richard Allen, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 18, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED
Date: November 30, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - STATUS HR 01/20 @ 2PM - JURY TRIAL 02/01 @ 9AM
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CREDIT TIME SERVED FORM 236 DAYS | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE NOLO CONTENDERE | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCE FORM | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL SENTENCING/PLEA SET FOR 09/20/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER P/S 9/20 @ 10AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.