Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lux, Sean filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bowman, Sean Michael, represented by Mcdonald, Patrick W., in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 03, 2020BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED UNEXECUTED | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL CALENDAR CALL SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.