Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maijala, David filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez, Jessica Bertha, represented by Maijala, David, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL CALENDAR CALL SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CC 1/20/21 @ 9AM | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL UNSERVED | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL CALENDAR CALL SET FOR 12/16/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.