Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Briggs-Seward, Shawn K. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gilliam, Carlos William, represented by Maijala, David, Reyes, Eric A, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 09, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL HEARING SET FOR 04/19/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL PRE TRIAL - CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/27/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERMIT SUBPOENA FOR TESTIMONY BY DCF INVESTIGATOR(S) | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PERMIT CHILD TO TESTIFY | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 4/27 @ 1:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.