Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allison, Caroline, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Christopher, Raymond, against Progressive Property Insurance Company, represented by Durocher, Joshua, Gunneson, Christian, Orr, David Dylan, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Caroline Allison against Progressive Property Insurance Company for breach of contract. The plaintiff seeks damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, costs, or attorney's fees. The defendant is an insurance compa...
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020031820
Date: July 27, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (O.4812.521. / 2977126) | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S FACT WITNESS DISCLOSURES | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S STATEMENT OF FACTS AND IDENTIFICATION OF DISPUTED FACTS | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CAROLINE ALLISON - 06/14/2021 @ 01:00 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.