Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Silver Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Caribbean Homes Of Florida, Llc, J&S Consulting & Construction, Llc, represented by Murphy, William Ryan, Powers, Robson D.C., Sanchez, Alvaro C, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by Silver Group, LLC against Caribbean Homes of Florida, LLC and J&S Consulting & Construction, LLC. The complaint alleges breach of contract and fraudulent lien. Silver Group is a Florida limited liability company that develo...
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: July 15, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER RECEIPT | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - RYAN MURPHY ESQ - AUGUST 30, 2021 THROUGH AND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 13, 2021 | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER RECEIPT | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE - RECORDED (O.4803.269. / 2970931) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION TO AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL/NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.