Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lux, Sean filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Lux, Sean, against Griffith, Eugene Alexander, represented by Maijala, David, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 26, 2020SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED
Date: November 12, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: November 16, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: September 09, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 19, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: November 05, 2020PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER CC 1/20/21 @ 9AM WST
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: February 25, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 11/3 9:00 - WST
Date: August 26, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: August 27, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - CMC 8/26 @ 1:30PM
Date: July 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 03, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 14, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: July 23, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 23, 2020SURETY BOND 2020AA005700 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: February 26, 2020RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: February 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: February 25, 2020INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 13, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE ERC 7/13 @ 8:30AM
Date: June 15, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CMC 7/22 @ 1:30PM - PLEA OFFER REJECTED
Date: July 13, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: March 03, 2020CITATION (TICKET)
Date: March 03, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 16, 2020BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: February 26, 2020SURETY BOND 2020AA005699 POSTED $2,500.00
Date: February 26, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: February 26, 2020BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: February 25, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 25, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CC 02/24 @ 9AM
Date: January 20, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST
Date: March 31, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CT1 NP, CT2 PLEA ENTERED - SENT 4/19 9:00
Date: March 31, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 03, 2021SENTENCE FORM
Date: March 31, 2021PRETRIAL ORDER
Date: February 26, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE JT 4/5 @ 9AM - STATUS HEARING /31 @ 11AM
Date: February 24, 2021FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CT1 NP, CT2 PLEA ENTERED - SENT 4/19 9:00 | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCE FORM | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL STATUS HEARING SET FOR 03/31/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/05/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL ORDER | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE JT 4/5 @ 9AM - STATUS HEARING /31 @ 11AM | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.