Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Emery, Donna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Agostino, Angela C, against Arellano Brothers Framing Company, Gustavo, Azpeitia, represented by Blain, Christopher J, Kaplan, Darah, Roush, Angela H, Pylitt, Adam Thomas, Schechter, Marc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Donna Emery against defendants Azpeitia Gustavo and Arellano Brothers Framing Company. The estimated value of the claim is in excess of $30,000. Donna Emery alleges that on July 20, 2018, Azpeitia Gustavo, while operating a...
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - GABRIEL ARELLANO ORTIZ - 2/17/2021 @ 3:00PM
Date: November 05, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING 1/20/2021 @ 9:15 AM
Date: December 04, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: November 11, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CARLOS ARELLANO ORTIZ - 2/17/2021 @ 2:00PM
Date: November 05, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM - DONNA EMERY - 2/16/2021 @ 2:00PM
Date: November 09, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AZPEITIA GUSTAVA - 2/17/2021 @ 10:00AM
Date: November 05, 2020REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 09, 2020AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: July 20, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: October 09, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 12, 2020NOTIEC OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 09, 2020DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 09, 2020PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 04, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 04, 2020NOTICE CANCELLING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 31, 2020PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 04, 2020DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 09, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 09, 2020DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 09, 2020DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 09, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANY - 4/22/2020
Date: April 27, 2020PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANY
Date: March 24, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 26, 2020STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 24, 2020SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 03-25-20 - AZPEITIA GUSTAVO
Date: March 24, 2020PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020021876
Date: March 25, 2020PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT AZPEITIA GUSTAVO
Date: March 24, 2020PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT AZPEITIA GUSTAVO
Date: March 24, 2020SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 03-25-20 - ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANY
Date: March 24, 2020PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANY
Date: March 24, 2020PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT AZPEITIA GUSTAVO
Date: March 24, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 24, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2020DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 06/28/2021 @ 11:00 AM
Date: June 25, 2021AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS
Date: June 25, 2021MOTION - DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2021DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: May 19, 2021MOTION - DEFENDANT ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANYS MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: July 13, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: February 11, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 21, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 28, 2021ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MASTER
Date: February 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER
Date: March 12, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 10, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 24, 2021DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 06/28/2021 @ 11:00 AM
Date: June 24, 2021REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: February 10, 2021DEFENDANT'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 17, 2021WITNESS LIST - PLAINTIFF''S WITNESS LIST
Date: June 17, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DONNA EMERY - 07/12/2021 @ 10:00 AM
Date: April 01, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 24, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 19, 2021AGREED ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY
Date: February 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: February 16, 2021DEFENDANT'S WITNESS & EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/28/2021 @ 11:00 AM
Date: April 06, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 09, 2021CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM - JUNE 28, 2021 11:00
Date: May 18, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 22, 2021DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 25, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 20, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: September 13, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING MANDATORY JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING - DECEMBER 6, 2021 @ 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - CONSENT OF CLIENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANYS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFENDANT ARELLANO BROTHERS FRAMING COMPANYS MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE ANGELA ROUSH ESQ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.