Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Briggs-Seward, Shawn K. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hall, Lavell Allen, represented by Hedvicek, Martina, Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: January 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: February 04, 2020BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT SERVED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF EXTRADITION- SACRAMENTO, CA | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING INDIGENCY - FEE ASSESSED IN 20-160-F | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL CALENDAR CALL SET FOR 09/22/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 08/25/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: ALESSANDRONI, PAUL | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER ASSIGNED | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE UNSECURED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.