Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Briggs-Seward, Shawn K. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Freed, Charles David, Freed, Charles David Jr, represented by Lombardo, Joseph Jr, Mcdonald, Patrick W., in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
This complaint is a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by Charles D. Freed, Jr. in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Charlotte County, Florida. Freed is currently incarcerated in the Charlotte County Jail and seeks transf...
ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: January 28, 2020SENTENCE FORM - CT1 &2 ADJ WITHHELD
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO COURT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO COURT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL HEARING SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TRANSFER PELTITIONER'S "PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS" TO CRIMINAL CASE | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | VIOLATION PLEA FORM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO BE SENT/ARR DURING AUDIOVISUAL 1ST APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.