Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mason, Donald H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Deleon Galindez, Jorge, represented by Gonzalez, Miguel A, Gonzalez, Miguel Angel, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: December 21, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: November 24, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: December 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.