Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bogle, Tauna Ren filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Blair, Shamar Dameon, represented by Lombardo, Joseph Jr, Maijala, David, Robson, John M, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 16, 2019MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, OR EXPENSES
Date: October 23, 2019MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, OR EXPENSES
Date: October 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: LOMBARDO, JOSEPH JR ASSIGNED | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL BASED UPON CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND APPOIUNTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL STATUS HEARING SET FOR 03/16/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
March 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: REGIONAL COUNSEL ASSIGNED | |
March 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - MOTION GRANTED - PD CONFLICT | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL STATUS HEARING SET FOR 03/11/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.