Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Davis, Brittney Alexandra filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Keller, Edgar Junior Jr, represented by Davis, Brittney Alexandra, Harris, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL ORDER | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE M/ GRANTED TO ALLOW VIDEO TESTIMONY | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) - MOTION TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY - 7/14 @ 11AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.