Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Garczewski, Jennifer M. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Garczewski, Jennifer M., Powers, Stephanie Mary, against Carrasquillo, Crystal Ashley, represented by Lombardo, Joseph Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: July 20, 2018COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CC 02/24 @ 9AM
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE HRG 12/3 @ 10AM | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE 9/22 @ 3PM | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL SENTENCING SET FOR 09/22/2021 AT 3:00 PM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED @ | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL SERVED | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE JT 8/23 @ 9AM | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: GARCZEWSKI, JENNIFER M. ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.