Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Diaz, Helen, Diaz, Luis A, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) - Recorded (O.3780.435 / 2192203) | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.3775.188 / 2188209) | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY JOSEPH HEINTZ 7/3-19, 2013 | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AS TO TIME EXPENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.