Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing, Lp, Nationstar Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aldridge Connors Llc, Aldridge Connors, Llp, against Alliance Funding A Division Of Superior Bank Fsb, Senna, Lisa M, Senna, Scott F, The Money Tree Lending Group Inc, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT- RECEIVED - ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLC | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLT | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT - MAILED TO ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLC | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | CHECK #108602 - MAILED TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC C/O ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLC | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED BOOK 2983 PAGE 2016 | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CHECK DISBURSEMENT APPROVAL FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.