Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2007-5 Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-5, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Pericles, Marie Helen, Pericles, Pascal, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (O.3856.1127 / 2257647) | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESS, MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY JOSEPH HEINTZ | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 9/3/13 3:30 P[M | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, PASCAL PERICLES AND MARIE HELEN PERICLES A/K/A MARIE H. PERICLES A/K/A MARIE PERICLES, MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.