Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing, Lp Fka Countrywide Home Loans Servcing, Lp, Nationstar Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Kaar, Vicki J, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc For Citibank Na A National Association, Unknown Spouse Of Vicki J Kaar, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3947/1415 | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $3,900.00 - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | BID LOG - $3,900.00 - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2015016053 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.