Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Charlotte County Clerk Of Court, Charlotte County Fl, Mergl, Kathleen M, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (O.3819.2088 / 2224303) | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 7/2/13 9AM | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - SET FOR 07/02/13 @ 9AM | |
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07/02/13 @9:00 AM | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | EMAIL LETTER FROM CLERK TO RONALD R WOLFE & ASSOCIATES RE:EFILE PLEADING SENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - JOE FARRALLE WRIGHT JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.