Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mietz, Deana M, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.3859.2200 / 2260657) | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED DEANA M. MIETZ; UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1 N/K/A DERRICK J. MIETZ; UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2 N/K/A SARAH MIETZ | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DEANA M MIETZ 1/7/13 | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKOWN TENANT 2 NKA SARAH MIETZ 1/7/13 | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA DERRICK J MIETZ 1/7/13 | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $940.00 RECEIPT #2013011770 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.