Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, Successor In Interest To Bank Of American, National Association As Trustee As Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank, National Association As Trustee For Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series Wmalt 2006-Ar4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Sowles, Gerald W, Sowles, Marguerite, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, Tenant #3, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3892/1410 | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2014038666 | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $2,800.00 U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCAITION AS TRUSTEE AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TURSTEE FOR WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES WMALT 2006-AR4 | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.