Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Graham, Carol E, Unknown Spouse Of Carol E Graham, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.3896.1538 / 2290745) | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED - CAROL E. GRAHAM | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE CANCELLING FORECLOSURE JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 08/04/14 9AM | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON RULE 1.420(E) NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES - LACK OF PROSECUTION VACATED - CMC 8/4/14 @ 9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.