Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Successor By Merger To Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A., As Trustee F K A Norwest Bank Minnesota, N.A., As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Clarfield Okon Salomone & Pincus, Mcmichael, Amber E. B., against Charlotte State Bank & Trust Successor By Merger Of Charlotte State Bank, Collins, Ruth M, Collins, Thomas, Collins, William J, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE WILLIAM J COLLINS ON APRIL 22, 2015 | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR 3114 WISTERIA PLACE, PUNTA GORDA, FL 33950 - FORWARDED TO CCSO WITH CK#6691701267 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2015027048 | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | PURCHASER'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3947/1556 | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.