Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Pawlak, Jeffrey Dean, Pawlak, Londa S, Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS- TENANT #2 | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS - SUNCOAST SCHOOLS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS- TENANT #1 | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS- JEFFERY DEAN PAWLAK A/K/A JEFFREY D. PAWLAK A/K/A JEFFREY PAWLAK | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS- LONDA S. PAWLAK A/K/A LONDA PAWLAK | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CASE | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.3722.510 / 2146828) | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,969.00 RECEIPT #2013011464 | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED LONDA S PAWLAK AKA LONDA PAWLAK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.