Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Charlotte County, A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida, Clerk Of The Court Twentieth Judicial Circuit In And For, Charlotte County Florida, Moritz, Theodora, Sullivan, Andrea M, Sullivan, Justin J, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3914/1164 | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO FLORIDA FORECLOSURE ATTORNEYS - NEED DOC STAMPS ($9.10) | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $1,300.00 BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $1,300.00 BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $505.00 RECEIPT #2014048928 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.