Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bermont Properties, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Dormevil, Magalie, Dormevil, Guy, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3808/76 | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | BID LOG - $100 TO BERMONT PROPERTIES LLC | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE - $100 TO BERMONT PROPERTIES LLOC | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2013043911 | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.