Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchem, Kathrine Irene, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories case in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING MANDATORY JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC) AND NOTICE OF HEARING, 04/25/136 @ 9:30AM | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND FUNDING OF A TRUST PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. 139P(D)(4)(A)- ** ORIGINAL FILED IN 12-2009CP | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2013011391 | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ESTABLISH A TRUST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.