Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Morris Hardwick Schneider Llc, against Bocilla Beach To Bay Property Owners Association Inc, Goodrich, David, Nusken, Matthew, Pinney Smith Llc, Preserve Of Don Pedro Owners Association Inc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PGS 3900/674-675 | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURESMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $32,500.00 BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $32,500.00 BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2014044217 | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 8/25/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.