Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cramer Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Murphy, Diana J, Murphy, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3808/1056 | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $68,900.00 CRAMER HOLDINGS, LLC, A WISCONSIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | BID LOG $68,900.00 CRAMER HOLDINGS, LLC, A WISCONSIN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 9/4/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.