Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gravel, Christina D, Gravel, Christopher G, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECK #104097 MAILED TO: KASS SHULER SOLOMON SPECTOR FOYLE & SINGER PA | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECK DISBURSEMENT APPROVAL FORM | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY GARNISHMENT ANSWER | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED CHARLOTTE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE ON JUNE 5, 2014 | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 6/8/2014 8:58AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.