Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marinosci Law Group, Zahm, Douglas C, against Croy, Karen M, Croy, Kenneth M, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc As Nominee For E-Loans Inc, South Gulf Cove Homeowners Association, Inc., Unknown Tenant #1 In Possession Of The Property, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT- RECEIVED MARINOSCI LAW GROUP P.C. | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT MARINOSCI LAW GROUP PC | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - FORECLOSED PROPERTIES LLC | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECK DISBURSEMENT APPROVAL FORM | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.