Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
German American Capital Corporation, A Maryland Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Boat House At Boaters World Llc, Deep Cove Llc, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryCommercial Foreclosure - $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (AMENDED) | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE SENT TO RECORDING - RE-RECORDED TO REFLECT CORRECT OWNERSHIP | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - OR BOOK 3779 PAGE 768 | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CT CORP | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.