Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenants Owners, Boca Vista At Burnt Store Lakes Condominium Association Inc, Forcella, Albert S Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3861/132 | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $75,100.00 WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $75,100.00 WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | URGENT LETTER FROM MELISSA DIJULIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.