Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Fka Bankers Trust Company Of California Nationa Association As Trustee For The Holders Of The Vendee Mortgage Trust 2003-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brock & Scott Pllc, Stephen C. Wilson, Popkin & Rosaler Pa, against Benaway, Barry, Benaway, Renate, Unknown Teants In Possession #1, Unknown Tenants In Possession #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED BK 3913 PG 360 | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $2,800.00 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FKA BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST 2003-2 | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $2,800.00 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY FKA BANKERS TRUST COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF THE VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST 2003-2 | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2014049145 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 10/02/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.