Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Frazer, Audrey, Frazer, William C, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED OR BK/PG 3888/1994 | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG $ 95,800.00 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-24CB) | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $ 95,800.00 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-24CB) | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING --CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 07/02/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.