Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Reid, Sarah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reid, Justin Levi Sr, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with YOUNG, BRANDON JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, BRANDON JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURNED MAIL | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISS OF MARRIAGE | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE REASSIGNMENT | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISS OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(REN) | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.