Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Monlyn, Linda, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Levin, Yitzhak Shmuel, against Foremost Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with GAY, SHONNA YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGAY, SHONNA YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
|
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MOTION TO STIKE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY FEE CLAIM PURSUANT TO FL STATUTE | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE REASSIGNMENT | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERR | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FOREMOST INSURANCE CO'S PRIVILEGE LOG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.