Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Martin, Kari Lynne, against Eby, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, ALLEN LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, ALLEN LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 30, 2015VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: July 30, 2015SUMMONS LINDA EBY
Date: July 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS (SENT TO ALBERTELLI LAW)/COPY OF CHECK | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | COPY OF ENVELOPE USED TO MAIL CHECK | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 Total Assessed $30,457.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $28,957.50 Receipt Number MX 2016003883 | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CUT CHECK FROM FEE ACCOUNT TO BE DEPOSITED INTO COURT REGISTRY | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2016003787 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.