Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Libeu, Aimee, against Harding, John Darral, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2007 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1210.1 | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Document, Filed | |
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Worksheet & Order, Filed | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
PC 1210.1 Graduation
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1210.1 | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
PC 1210.1 Review
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Progress per PC 1210.1(c), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.