Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hofer, Jeremy Lee, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
October 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.