Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Espinozagavina, Hector Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
December 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.