Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Veldstra, Christina Ann, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeredith, Lynne R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Ability to Pay - Order Granted | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Ability to Pay - Requested | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Financial Declaration | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to FTB | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | *Failure to Pay: Pending FTB | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.