Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Loo, Guifong, Loo, Sandra, Sandra And Guifong Loo,, filed a(n) 3 case represented by De La Osa, Edward, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Guanciale, James John, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: July 05, 2023Witness List
Date: July 05, 2023Notice
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTIONParty: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List Party: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Party: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change from de la osa damage lawyers to de prado/de la osa |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served FIRST CLAIM PUBLIC ADJUSTERS, |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.