Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James, Alvin, James, Carolyn, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Fletcher, Jason Franklin, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Thompson, Charles Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 23, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 23, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: October 03, 2022Case Management Order
Date: October 17, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: October 17, 2022Copy of Correspondence
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: November 02, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 15, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 12, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 17, 2023Request for Admissions
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 18, 2023Request for Production
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 07, 2023Privilege Log
Date: February 07, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: February 07, 2023Agreed Order Granting
Date: February 15, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 07, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: February 16, 2023Notice
Date: March 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Consent Order of Liquidation, Notice of Automatic and Permanent StayParty: Defendant UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.